This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2023 at 01:08:04 (UTC).

Estate of Tanya Marie Johnson aka Tanya Johnson Brandes

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Estate of Tanya Marie Johnson aka Tanya Johnson Brandes was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Olga Alvarez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Olga Alvarez

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Administrators, Not Classified By Court and Executors

Chhokar, Siddharth

Ornett, Sabrina

Spicer, John

Ballard, Paula

McLaughlin, John

Phillips, Marina

Rogers, Bennett

Wangmo, Chimi

Decedent

Johnson, Tanya Marie; AKA : Brandes, Tanya Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Administrator, Not Classified By Court and Executor Attorneys

Corday, Chrissa N

Owens, Matthew R.

SYNOLD, JEROME R

Greco, David G

Szachowicz, Phillip J.

 

Court Documents

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

First and Final Report of Personal Representative & Petition for Final Distribution

Waiver of Final Accounting (First and Final Report of Personal Representative & Petition for Final Distribution on: Waiver of Account; Payment of Extraordinary Fees to Attorney; Payment of Costs/Reimbursements; Reissuance/Extension of Letters) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/09/2023 03:15:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Olga Alvarez.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 07/20/2023 02:30:00 PM.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Amended Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Notice of Entry of Order July 23 2021

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record (roa#133) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Letters Extended/Reissued

Letters Extended/Reissued (Letters Expire: 09/30/2023) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Letters Extended/Reissued

Letters Extended/Reissued (Expire 07/20/2023) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Ex Parte scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 03:15:00 PM at Central in 503 Olga Alvarez.

[Proposed] Letters

[Proposed] Letters submitted by Chhokar, Siddharth received but not filed on 05/08/2023.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Petition to Extend Letters/Reissue Letters & Report of Status of Administration) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Executor)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Executor)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (roa#133) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLetters Extended/Reissued (Letters Expire: 09/30/2023) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Executor)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 07/20/2023 02:30:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketWaiver of Final Accounting(First and Final Report of Personal Representative & Petition for Final Distribution on: Waiver of Account; Payment of Extraordinary Fees to Attorney; Payment of Costs/Reimbursements; Reissuance/Extension of Letters) filed by Siddharth Chhokar was granted as modified.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Probate Notes filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketLetters Extended/Reissued (Expire 07/20/2023) filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Executor)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/09/2023 03:15:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
108 More Docket Entries
07/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021

Docket[Proposed] Order submitted by Chhokar, Siddharth received but not filed on 07/14/2021.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket[A document for ROA# 5]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket[Proposed] Letters submitted by Chhokar, Siddharth received but not filed on 07/14/2021.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Chhokar, Siddharth.; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration filed by Chhokar, Siddharth. Refers to: Johnson, Tanya; Chhokar, Siddharth; Filed By: Chhokar, Siddharth (Petitioner)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketA Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less