This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 08:23:23 (UTC).

Estate of Stephen Dana May

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 Estate of Stephen Dana May was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

MRAKOVICH, SHARON

Decedent

MAY, STEPHEN DANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

RIFBJERG, KURT

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative (LATE) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 08/03/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Surety Bond

Surety Bond ($20,000.00) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration (Letters expire: 02/03/2019) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (ONE - $500,000) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim ($120.71) filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd..

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. on behalf of Citibank, N.A.) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Waiver of Final Accounting

Waiver of Final Accounting (Petition For Order Approving And/Or Allowing; First and Final Report of Administrator with Waiver of Account and For Settlement thereof; for approval of reimbursement) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Refers to: May, Stephen; Mrakovich, Sharon

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Refers to: May, Stephen

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 08/03/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 06/27/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Final Accounting (Petition For Order Approving And/Or Allowing; First and Final Report of Administrator with Waiver of Account and For Settlement thereof; for approval of reimbursement) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. on behalf of Citibank, N.A.) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final (and Partial No. 2) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim ($120.71) filed by Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd.. Filed By: Phillips & Cohen Associates, Ltd. (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (ONE - $500,000) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration (Letters expire: 02/03/2019) filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 08/03/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 08/03/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in PC-3 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Refers to: May, Stephen Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Mrakovich, Sharon. Refers to: May, Stephen; Mrakovich, Sharon Filed By: Mrakovich, Sharon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less