This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 10:53:33 (UTC).

Estate of Roger P. Wilson

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 Estate of Roger P Wilson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Executors

WILSON, HELEN

WILSON, DALE

Decedent

WILSON, ROGER P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

CRABTREE, DANIEL B

3143 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92103-5802

 

Court Documents

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

Returned Mail

Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act (Lost Will) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Refers to: Wilson, Roger; Wilson, Dale

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Refers to: Wilson, Roger

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. CRABTREE RE: LOST WILL) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 10/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

Letters Testamentary

Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 04/05/2019) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 04/05/2019) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 10/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Court updated role of Dale Wilson to Executor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • The Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act(Lost Will) filed by Dale Wilson and Helen Wilson is granted. Court appointed Dale Wilson as Executor for the Estate of Roger P. Wilson on 10/05/2017. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. CRABTREE RE: LOST WILL) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Proposed Executor); Wilson, Helen (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Refers to: Wilson, Roger Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Petitioner); Wilson, Helen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act (Lost Will) filed by Wilson, Dale; Wilson, Helen. Refers to: Wilson, Roger; Wilson, Dale Filed By: Wilson, Dale (Petitioner); Wilson, Helen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less