This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 10:26:24 (UTC).

Estate of Robert V. Allen

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 Estate of Robert filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against Allen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Executors

BRADSHAW, NANCY JEAN

ALLEN, ROBERTA MAY

Decedent

ALLEN, ROBERT V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

HOOVER, ADAM T

4675 Macarthur Court 550

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Notice of Death

Notice - Other (Notice of Death) filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean. Refers to: Allen, Robert; Allen, Roberta; Bradshaw, Nancy

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Allen, Roberta May.

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Allen, Roberta May.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (notice of lodging original will and codicil of Robert V. Allen) filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May.

Will dated 06/20/1991 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

Will dated 06/20/1991 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

Codicil dated 05/23/2002 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

Codicil dated 05/23/2002 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 10/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (and Letters) submitted by Allen, Roberta May rejected on 10/24/2017.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean.

Letters Testamentary

Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 04/05/2019) filed by Allen, Roberta May.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Death) filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner); Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner); Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 04/05/2019) filed by Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner); Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate (and Letters) submitted by Allen, Roberta May rejected on 10/24/2017. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 10/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Court updated role of Nancy Jean Bradshaw to Co-Executor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Court updated role of Roberta May Allen to Co-Executor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Codicil dated 05/23/2002 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Will dated 06/20/1991 admitted to probate on 10/05/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (notice of lodging original will and codicil of Robert V. Allen) filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner); Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner); Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bradshaw, Nancy Jean; Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner); Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Allen, Roberta May. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean. Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Proposed Executor); Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/05/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed by Allen, Roberta May; Bradshaw, Nancy Jean. Refers to: Allen, Robert; Allen, Roberta; Bradshaw, Nancy Filed By: Allen, Roberta May (Petitioner); Bradshaw, Nancy Jean (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less