This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 08:52:55 (UTC).

Estate of Ray Skoff vs. GIGLIO

Case Summary

On 05/22/2012 Estate of Ray Skoff filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GIGLIO. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust

Estate of Ray Skoff

Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust

Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust

Miller, Diane

Ray Skoff Trust

Schwab, Kathleen

Skoff North Park II LLC

Skoff Olympic Gateway Parkway LLC

Skoff Sunriver LLC

Skoff-One Hanover LLC

Willsey, Ilene

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Sentra Securities Corp

Elhoff, David

Mick, Bryan

MICK & ASSOCIATES PC LLO; AKA : MICK & ASSOCIATES PC LLO

INDEPENDENT FINANCIAL GROUP; AKA : INDEPENDENT FINANCIAL GROUP LLP

BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES, P.C., LLO; ESA : BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES;ESA : BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Mick, Bryan

BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES, P.C., LLO; ESA : BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES;ESA : BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEFKOWITZ, DAVID I

Attorney at WILSHIRE PALISADES LAW GROUP

1337 Ocean Ave

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Shewry, Steven M

402 W Broadway #950

San Diego, CA 92101

Smith, Nathan

Attorney at MARKUN ZUSMAN FRENIERE & COMPTON LLP

465 California Street Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

BILDER, MARSHALL

50 W State Street 1400

Trenton, NJ 08608

EVANS, BRETT G.

Attorney at HULL EVANS & KOB LLP

180 E Main Street 104

Tustin, CA 92780

FEINSTEIN, JASON

KOB, JEFFREY S

Attorney at HULL EVANS & KOB LLP

180 East Main Street 104

Tustin, CA 92780

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve

Certificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (GRANTED TO 8/17/12) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State (SENTRA SECURITIES CORP) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: SENTRA SECURITIES CORP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (DAVID ELHOFF) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: Elhoff, David

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State (BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: Bryan Mick & Associates

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State (BRYAN MICK) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: Mick, Bryan

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to Extend time to repsond) submitted by Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC rejected on 08/10/2012.

Demurrer

Demurrer (& Supporting Docs) filed by Independent Financial Group LLC; Elhoff, David.

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Mick, Bryan.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Independent Financial Group LLC; Elhoff, David.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 09/14/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 Lorna Alksne.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (Notice of Motion and motion to strike prayer to plaintiff's complaint and supporting declarations) filed by Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 25]

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/07/2012 08:30:00 AM.

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Skoff North Park II LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Skoff Olympic Gateway Parkway LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Skoff Sunriver LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Skoff-One Hanover LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Schwab, Kathleen .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Willsey, Ilene .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Ray Skoff Trust.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State (BRYAN MICK & ASSOCIATES) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: Bryan Mick & Associates Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (DAVID ELHOFF) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: Elhoff, David Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State (SENTRA SECURITIES CORP) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Refers to: SENTRA SECURITIES CORP Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (GRANTED TO 8/17/12) filed by Estate of Ray Skoff. Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Alksne, Lorna.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff); Ray Skoff Trust (Plaintiff); Miller, Diane (Plaintiff); Willsey, Ilene (Plaintiff); Schwab, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff); Ray Skoff Trust (Plaintiff); Miller, Diane (Plaintiff); Willsey, Ilene (Plaintiff); Schwab, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Estate of Ray Skoff; Ray Skoff Trust; Miller, Diane; Willsey, Ilene; Schwab, Kathleen; Diane Miller as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Ilene Willsey as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Kathleen Schwab as Trustee of the Ray Skoff Trust; Skoff-One Hanover LLC; Skoff Sunriver LLC;OTHERS. Refers to: GIGLIO, E; Elhoff, David; Independent Financial Group LLC; SENTRA SECURITIES CORP; Mick, Bryan; Bryan Mick & Associates Filed By: Estate of Ray Skoff (Plaintiff); Ray Skoff Trust (Plaintiff); Miller, Diane (Plaintiff); Willsey, Ilene (Plaintiff); Schwab, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Independent Financial Group is a litigant