This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 07:11:20 (UTC).

Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar vs The Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar

Nahid, Rumana

Nashid, Tarana

Nazreen, Fahima

Sattar, Kamrunness

Zubair, Noman

Defendants

Carazo, Matthew

Maguire, Kathleen

Phreaner, Nicholas

The Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Matthew T

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/29/2023 08:45:00 AM.

Declaration in Support of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Declaration in Support of Nunc Pro Tunc Order (of Matthew T Williams) filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana.

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Proposed Order submitted by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana received but not filed on 04/04/2023.

Declaration in Support of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana.

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Proposed Order submitted by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana received but not filed on 04/05/2023.

of Matthew T Williams

Declaration - Other (of Matthew T Williams) filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/06/2023 08:45:00 AM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Nunc Pro Tunc Order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/06/2023 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Matthew T Williams) filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana.; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana received but not filed on 04/05/2023.; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana.; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Nazreen, Fahima; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana received but not filed on 04/04/2023.; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/29/2023 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar; Sattar, Kamrunness; Zubair, Noman; Nazreen, Fahima; Nahid, Rumana; Nashid, Tarana. Refers to: The Regents of the University of California; Carazo, Matthew; Maguire, Kathleen; Phreaner, Nicholas; Filed By: Estate of Mohammed Abdus Sattar (Plaintiff); Sattar, Kamrunness (Plaintiff); Zubair, Noman (Plaintiff); Nazreen, Fahima (Plaintiff); Nahid, Rumana (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less