This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 09:01:04 (UTC).

Estate of Marshall J. Orloff

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Estate of Marshall J Orloff was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John B Scherling. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John B Scherling

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

Orloff, Lisa Ann

Decedent

Orloff, Marshall J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

Cunneen, Dawn

 

Court Documents

[Proposed] Letters of Special Administration

Letters of Special Administration (Expire: 11/05/2022) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Salaz CSR#8972) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (& Letters) submitted by Orloff, Lisa Ann rejected on 05/03/2021.

Second Revised Proposed Order

Order for Probate (Special Administrator) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

Proposed Order

Order for Probate (Special Administrator) submitted by Orloff, Lisa Ann received but not filed on 04/26/2021.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/27/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Petition for Letters of Special Administration (Ex Parte) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Refers to: Orloff, Marshall; Orloff, Lisa

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet

Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF OWEN ORLOFF

Declaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Owen Orrloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF MARK STUART ORLOFF

Declaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Mark Stuart Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF KAREN JEANNE ORLOFF

Declaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Karen Jeanne Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ERIC RUSSELL ORLOFF

Declaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Eric Russell Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF BRUCE GRAHAM ORLOFF

Declaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Bruce Graham Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

DECLINATION TO SERVE AS EXECUTOR AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SUSAN LOUISE ORLOFF

Consent - Other filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration (Expire: 11/05/2022) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Special Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate (& Letters) submitted by Orloff, Lisa Ann rejected on 05/03/2021. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Special Administrator) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Salaz CSR#8972) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/27/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Probate (Special Administrator) submitted by Orloff, Lisa Ann received but not filed on 04/26/2021. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 John B Scherling.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent - Other filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Special Administration (Ex Parte) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Refers to: Orloff, Marshall; Orloff, Lisa Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Owen Orrloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Mark Stuart Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Karen Jeanne Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Eric Russell Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declination to Serve as Executor and Waiver of Notice of Bruce Graham Orloff) filed by Orloff, Lisa Ann. Filed By: Orloff, Lisa Ann (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Scherling, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cunneen, Dawn Hall