This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 01:43:25 (UTC).

Estate of Mark L. Suelflohn

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Estate of Mark L Suelflohn was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator With Will Annexed

Roberts, Tim

Decedent

Suelflohn, Mark L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

Bolander, Lori

Attorney at GALLAGHER BOLANDER SMEDLEY LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Roberts, Tim.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Roberts, Tim.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Roberts, Tim. Refers to: Suelflohn, Mark; Roberts, Tim

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Roberts, Tim. Refers to: Suelflohn, Mark

Proof of Holographic Instrument

Proof of Holographic Instrument (Tim Roberts) filed by Roberts, Tim.

Proof of Holographic Instrument

Proof of Holographic Instrument (Ellis M. Johnston) filed by Roberts, Tim.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 04/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Receipt for Deposited Will SD

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for Probate - Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Roberts, Tim. Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Roberts, Tim. Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Proposed Administrator With Will Annexed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 04/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Roberts, Tim. Refers to: Suelflohn, Mark; Roberts, Tim Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Roberts, Tim. Refers to: Suelflohn, Mark Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument (Tim Roberts) filed by Roberts, Tim. Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Holographic Instrument (Ellis M. Johnston) filed by Roberts, Tim. Filed By: Roberts, Tim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketA Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.