This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 09:25:49 (UTC).

Estate of Luis C Avelar

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Estate of Luis C Avelar was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

AVELAR, GUADALUPE

Decedent

AVELAR, LUIS C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Executor Attorney

SPARHAWK, CHERI L

Attorney at HUBKA & HUBKA ATTORNEY S

5555 Jackson Drive 206

La Mesa, CA 91942

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Refers to: Avelar, Luis; Avelar, Guadalupe

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Refers to: Avelar, Luis

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition (FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO THE PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (Bank of America N.A., $2,799.43) filed by Bank of America N.A..

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Letters Testamentary

Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 03/01/2019) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Check #11882) submitted by Avelar, Guadalupe rejected on 09/06/2017.

Self-Proving Will dated 04/04/2017 admitted to probate on 08/31/2017. - 08/31/2017

Self-Proving Will dated 04/04/2017 admitted to probate on 08/31/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 08/31/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (No. 2 - $4,900.00) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (No. 1 - $482,000.00) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (No. 1 - $482,000.00) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (No. 2 - $4,900.00) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 08/31/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Court updated role of Guadalupe Avelar to Executor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Self-Proving Will dated 04/04/2017 admitted to probate on 08/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • The Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Guadalupe Avelar is granted. Court appointed Guadalupe Avelar as Executor for the Estate of Luis C Avelar on 08/31/2017. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Check #11882) submitted by Avelar, Guadalupe rejected on 09/06/2017. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters Testamentary (Letters expire: 03/01/2019) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim (Bank of America N.A., $2,799.43) filed by Bank of America N.A.. Filed By: Bank of America N.A. (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition (FIRST SUPPLEMENT TO THE PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER THE INDEPENDENT ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATES ACT) filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Will submitted by Avelar, Guadalupe received but not filed on 07/14/2017. Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Refers to: Avelar, Luis Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Avelar, Guadalupe. Refers to: Avelar, Luis; Avelar, Guadalupe Filed By: Avelar, Guadalupe (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less