Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/18/2019 at 06:55:16 (UTC).

Estate of Katherine Kenner Gardner

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 Estate of Katherine Kenner Gardner was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BOSTWICK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BOSTWICK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

RICHARDSON, LORRAINE

Decedent

GARDNER, KATHERINE KENNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

BECKSTRAND, DWIGHT

985 Wigeon Way

Arroyo Grande, CA 93420

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Richardson, Lorraine. Refers to: Gardner, Katherine; Richardson, Lorraine

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Richardson, Lorraine.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Richardson, Lorraine.

Order for Probate (proposed)

Order for Probate submitted by Richardson, Lorraine received but not filed on 09/01/2017.

Order for Probate (proposed)

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 09/05/2017 11:00:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (& Letters) submitted by Richardson, Lorraine rejected on 10/23/2017.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Letters of Administration submitted by Richardson, Lorraine rejected on 10/24/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 11/07/2017 11:00:00 AM.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 11/07/2017 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration submitted by Richardson, Lorraine rejected on 10/24/2017. Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate (& Letters) submitted by Richardson, Lorraine rejected on 10/23/2017. Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 09/05/2017 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Petition for Probate continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/07/2017 at 11:00AM before Judge Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate submitted by Richardson, Lorraine received but not filed on 09/01/2017. Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Richardson, Lorraine. Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in PC-1 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Richardson, Lorraine. Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Richardson, Lorraine. Refers to: Gardner, Katherine; Richardson, Lorraine Filed By: Richardson, Lorraine (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dwight G Beckstrand