This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 07:00:45 (UTC).

Estate of Joelle S Carrine

Case Summary

On 04/24/2017 Estate of Joelle S Carrine was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONGSTRETH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONGSTRETH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

CARRINE, KEVIN J

Decedent

CARRINE, JOELLE S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

YPHANTIDES, JOHN G

539 W Grand Ave

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration (EXPIRE 12/08/2018) filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary; Allowance of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Waiver of Statutory Fees to Administrator; and Petition for Final Distribution

Waiver of Final Accounting (First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary; Allowance of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Waiver of Statutory Fees to Administrator; and Petition for Final Distribution) filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 02/01/2018 02:30:00 PM.

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Refers to: Carrine, Joelle; Carrine, Kevin

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Carrine, Kevin J.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 02/01/2018 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Waiver of Final Accounting(First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary; Allowance of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Waiver of Statutory Fees to Administrator; and Petition for Final Distribution) filed by Kevin J. Carrine was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 02/01/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Final Accounting (First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for its Settlement; Waiver of Accounting By Beneficiary; Allowance of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Waiver of Statutory Fees to Administrator; and Petition for Final Distribution) filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Court updated role of Kevin J Carrine to Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • The Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Kevin J. Carrine is granted. Court appointed Kevin J. Carrine as Administrator for the Estate of Joelle S Carrine on 06/08/2017. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-3 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Carrine, Kevin J. Refers to: Carrine, Joelle; Carrine, Kevin Filed By: Carrine, Kevin J (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less