This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:38:40 (UTC).

Estate of Jennifer Topaz Irvine aka Jennifer T. Irvine

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 Estate of Jennifer Topaz Irvine aka Jennifer T Irvine was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners

IRVINE, SAMUEL B

IRVINE, JASON

Welling, Kaitlyn

Decedent

IRVINE, JENNIFER TOPAZ; AKA : IRVINE, JENNIFER T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

INGOLD, SCOTT J

Attorney at HIGGS FLETCHER & MACK LLP

First National Bank Center, 401 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

MONSON, THOMAS M

MONTISANO, SHANNON N

Attorney at HUGHES & PIZZUTO APC

401 B Street Ste 2400

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Order - Other

Order - Other (Ex Parte Order to Increase Bond) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/28/2018 03:15:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Account and Report (Estates) scheduled for 06/13/2019 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Declaration of Parisa F. Weiss, Esq. in Support of Request for Extraordinary Attorney Fees

Declaration - Other (declaration of Parisa F. Weiss in support of request for extraordinary attorney fees) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Amended Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (amended allowance or rejection of creditor's claim) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Receipt of Distribution

Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - Kaitlyn Welling - $14,693.99) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Receipt of Distribution

Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - M Irvine) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (Claim for $1,629.15) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Irvine, Jennifer Topaz.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Welling, Kaitlyn.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (and Letters) submitted by Irvine, Jason rejected on 01/08/2018.

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Refers to: Irvine, Jennifer

Statement - Other

Statement - Other filed by Irvine, Samuel B.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other (consent of Donald Irvine to the appointment of Darren Pirozzi) filed by Irvine, Samuel B.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act submitted by Irvine, Jason rejected on 11/07/2017.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Irvine, Jason.

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt of Final Distribution) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - S Irvine) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - D Irvine) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - M Irvine) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Receipt on Final Distribution) filed by Irvine, Jason. Filed By: Irvine, Jason (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - Kaitlyn Welling - $14,693.99) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - Seltzer Caplan McMahon Vitek - $19,868.89) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order on First and Final Report of Administrator & Petition for Final Distribution on Account; Payment of Statutory Fees to Administrator; Payment of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Payment of Extraordinary Fees to Attorney; and Reimbursement of Costs Ad) filed by Welling, Kaitlyn. Filed By: Welling, Kaitlyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Account and Report (Estates) heard 06/13/2019 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Petition for Final Distribution(First and Final Report of Administrator & Petition for Final Distribution on Account; Payment of Statutory Fees to Administrator; Payment of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Payment of Extraordinary Fees to Attorney; and Reimbursement of Costs Advanced...) filed by Kaitlyn Welling was granted pursuant to signed order on file.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other (consent of Donald Irvine to the appointment of Darren Pirozzi) filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 12/07/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement - Other filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Irvine, Samuel B. Refers to: Irvine, Jennifer Filed By: Irvine, Samuel B (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less