This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 06:36:31 (UTC).

Estate of Janet Jeanine Williams

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 Estate of Janet Jeanine Williams was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Executor and Administrator With Will Annexed

MOLLRING, SHANE

Decedent

WILLIAMS, JANET JEANINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Executor and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

KLOMPARENS, ROBIN L

10640 Mather Boulevard Ste 200

Mather, CA 95655

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Mollring, Shane.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence submitted by Lacey, Darius rejected on 05/09/2017.

Waiver of Bond

Waiver - Other (Waiver of Bond RE: Jason Mollrino) filed by Mollring, Shane.

Waiver of Bond

Waiver - Other (Waiver of Bond RE: Tyler Mollring) filed by Mollring, Shane.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mollring, Shane.

Waiver - Other

Waiver - Other (Jason Mollring) filed by Mollring, Shane.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition filed by Mollring, Shane.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Mollring, Shane.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Letters of Administration with Will Annexed submitted by Mollring, Shane rejected on 07/19/2017.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 34]

Letters of Administration with Will Annexed

Letters of Administration with Will Annexed (Letters expire: 12/29/2018) filed by Mollring, Shane.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Mollring, Shane.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Mollring, Shane.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mollring, Shane. Refers to: Williams, Janet

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence submitted by Laley, Darius rejected on 04/19/2017.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 07/26/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Final Accounting (Waiver of Account and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for Its Settlement; for Approval of Statutory Attorneys' Compensation and Costs; and Petition for Final Distribution) filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration with Will Annexed (Letters expire: 12/29/2018) filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Letters of Administration with Will Annexed submitted by Mollring, Shane rejected on 07/26/2017. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 34]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration with Will Annexed submitted by Mollring, Shane rejected on 07/19/2017. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/29/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence submitted by Lacey, Darius rejected on 05/09/2017. Filed By: Lacey, Darius (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Correspondence submitted by Laley, Darius rejected on 04/19/2017. Filed By: Laley, Darius (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mollring, Shane. Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Proposed Executor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/01/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mollring, Shane. Refers to: Williams, Janet Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Mollring, Shane. Refers to: Williams, Janet Filed By: Mollring, Shane (Petitioner); Mollring, Shane (Administrator With Will Annexed)

    Read MoreRead Less