This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 06:56:47 (UTC).

Estate of James F. Wilson aka James Francis Wilson aka James Wilson

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 Estate of James F Wilson aka James Francis Wilson aka James Wilson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Decedent

WILSON, JAMES F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

SEIKALY, GEORGE

Attorney at COUNTY COUNSEL

1600 Pacific Highway 355

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 06/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (California Business Bureau, Inc. FOR: Scripps Clinic;$186.00) filed by California Business Bureau, Inc..

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (State of California Franchise Tax Board; $39,686.22) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board.

Request for Special Notice

Request for Special Notice filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Claim is Allowed for in the Amount of: $186.00) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Inventory and Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sale

Inventory and Appraisal - Reappraisal for Sale (No. 1; Property Tax Certificate) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service By Mail of Final Inventory and Appraisal Filed on 02/13/2018) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Refers to: Wilson, James; PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service By Mail of Final Inventory and Appraisal Filed on 02/13/2018) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (California Business Bureau, Inc. (For: Scripps Clinic)) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim ($885.00) filed by California Business Bureau, Inc.. Filed By: California Business Bureau, Inc. (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board. Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board. Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (1; Property Tax Certificate) filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • Court updated role of PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR to Administrator.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • The Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Public Administrator is granted. Court appointed Public Administrator as Administrator for the Estate of James F. Wilson aka James Francis Wilson aka James Wilson on 06/08/2017. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/08/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Refers to: Wilson, James Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR. Refers to: Wilson, James; PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR Filed By: PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less