This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:10:05 (UTC).

Estate of Ibrahim Mahmoud Elsawah

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 Estate of Ibrahim Mahmoud Elsawah was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

ELSAWAH, OMAR

Decedent

ELSAWAH, IBRAHIM MAHMOUD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

SNOW, DAMIEN J

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

2635 Camino Del Rio South 110

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final ($450,000.00) filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Response to Probate Notes

Response to Probate Notes filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 03/07/2019 02:30:00 PM.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Supplement to Petition

Supplement to Petition (supplement to petition for letters of administration LATE) filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary (LATE) filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (nomination of Omar Elsawah LATE) filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim (Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.; $8,793.58) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final ($510,000.00) filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Full Satisfaction of Creditor's Claim of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N.A..

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Elsawah, Omar. Refers to: Elsawah, Ibrahim; Elsawah, Omar

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Elsawah, Omar. Refers to: Elsawah, Ibrahim

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Elsawah, Omar.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Elsawah, Omar.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 03/07/2019 02:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Waiver of Final Accounting(First and Final Report of Personal Representative & Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account) filed by Omar Elsawah was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal Attachment filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Probate Notes filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver - Other (waiver of account of personal representative) filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Final Accounting (First and Final Report of Personal Representative & Petition for Final Distribution on Waiver of Account) filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration submitted by Elsawah, Omar rejected on 05/09/2017. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 05/25/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Allegation of Known Estate Liabilities by Proposed Personal Representative) filed by Elsawah, Omar. Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Elsawah, Omar. Refers to: Elsawah, Ibrahim Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Elsawah, Omar. Refers to: Elsawah, Ibrahim; Elsawah, Omar Filed By: Elsawah, Omar (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less