This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/13/2018 at 10:49:45 (UTC).

Estate of Gregory Clyde Mohler

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 Estate of Gregory Clyde Mohler was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOPKINS, PAMELA

Administrator

ARMBRUSTER, LYNDA

Decedent

MOHLER, GREGORY CLYDE

Not Classified By Court

MOHLER, RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GUTMAN, TOMER TAYLOR

Attorney at WORDEN WILLIAMS APC

462 Stevens Avenue 100

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOUCK, DEWARD J

Other Attorneys

LINDSLEY, PHILIP PALMER

Attorney at PHILIP P LINDSLEY APLC

7880 Golfcrest Dr

San Diego, CA 92119

DIERINGER, D ROBERT

7880 Golfcrest Dr

San Diego, CA 92119

 

Court Documents

Waiver of Final Accounting

Waiver of Final Accounting (First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for (1) Waiver of Account and Approval of all Acts of Administrator; (2) Ratification of Settlement Agreement, etc...) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim) filed by Hopkins, Pamela.

Waiver - Other

Waiver - Other (Waiver of Account by Ronald Reid Mohler) filed by Mohler, Ronald.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Order for Probate (and Letters) submitted by Armbruster, Lynda; Armbruster, Lynda rejected on 05/09/2017.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Hopkins, Pamela.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Mohler, Ronald.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION AND PURCHASE ORDER FOR MOBILE HOME) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (Partial No. 3) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Inventory and Appraisal - Corrected

Inventory and Appraisal - Corrected (Partial No. 2) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex-Parte Petition To Increase Bond) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (notice of ex parte petition to increase bond) filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Ex Parte scheduled for 05/22/2018 at 03:15:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Refers to: Mohler, Gregory; Armbruster, Lynda

Consent - Other

Consent - Other (Consent to Act as Administrator by Lynda Armsbruster) filed by Hopkins, Pamela.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Affidavit of Good Faith

Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Armbruster, Lynda.

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Distribution (Receipt on Final Distribution - Ronald Mohler) filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution heard 08/07/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Waiver of Final Accounting(First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for (1) Waiver of Account and Approval of all Acts of Administrator; (2) Ratification of Settlement Agreement, etc...) filed by Lynda Armbruster was granted pursuant to signed order on file.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Waiver of Accounting (Order for First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for (1) Waiver of Account and Approval of All Acts of Administrator; (2) Ratification of Settlement Agreement; (3) Allowance of Statutory Compensation to Administrator and Attorney...) filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (Supplement to First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for ....) filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement - Other (Supplement to First and Final Report of Administrator and Petition for (1) Waiver of Account and Approval of All Acts of Administrator; (2) Ratification of Settlement Agreement; (3) Allowance of Statutory Compensation to Administrator and Attorney...) filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Surety Bond ($379958.02) filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver - Other (Waiver of Account by Ronald Reid Mohler) filed by Mohler, Ronald. Filed By: Mohler, Ronald (Objector)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Petition (LATE;Supplement to Petition For Letters of Administration) filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Filed By: Hopkins, Pamela (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Good Faith filed by Armbruster, Lynda. Filed By: Armbruster, Lynda (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Filed By: Hopkins, Pamela (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 04/06/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other (Consent to Act as Administrator by Lynda Armsbruster) filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Filed By: Hopkins, Pamela (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Refers to: Mohler, Gregory; Armbruster, Lynda Filed By: Hopkins, Pamela (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Hopkins, Pamela. Refers to: Mohler, Gregory; Armbruster, Lynda Filed By: Hopkins, Pamela (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less