This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 14:21:40 (UTC).

Estate of Eugenija Jappchen

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 Estate of Eugenija Jappchen was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Administrators

KRIJANOVSKY, LYGIA

JAPPCHEN, EVA E

Decedent

JAPPCHEN, EUGENIJA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorneys

BALOK, ELAINE

7777 Alvarado Road 249

La Mesa, CA 91942

SHILLINGER, LOAN T

8880 Rio San Diego Drive Ste 800

San Diego, CA 92108

STEIN, GINA D

4350 La Jolla Village Dr Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (1 (Property Tax Certificate) $1,365,423.94) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 01/18/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/12/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (The Ex Parte Application for an Order to Set Aside Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration Granted on September 19, 2017; Or in The Alternative Amend Order Granting Special Administration to Add Elizabeth Toma Danovsky as...) filed by Danovsky, Elizabeth Toma.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Loan Shillinger Regarding Notice of the Ex Parte Application for an Order to Set Aside Ex Parte Application for an Order to Set Aside Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration or in The Alternative Amend Order Adding...) filed by Danovsky, Elizabeth Toma.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 10/12/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Jappchen, Eva E.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 01/18/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Proof of Electronic Service) filed by Jappchen, Eva E.

Letters of Special Administration

Letters of Special Administration (Expire: 01/18/2018) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia.

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (1 (Property Tax Certificate) $1,365,423.94) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Administration (Letters expire: 7/24/2019) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Surety Bond ($1,600,000.00) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 01/18/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Court ordered initial bond posted in the amount of $1,600,000 for a total bond of $1,600,000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • The Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Lygia Krijanovsky is granted. Court appointed Lygia Krijanovsky as Administrator for the Estate of Eugenija Jappchen on 01/18/2018. Letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 01/18/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Court ordered the Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Ex Parte Cover Sheet filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration) filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 10/12/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Refers to: Jappchen, Eugenija Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Krijanovsky, Lygia. Refers to: Jappchen, Eugenija; Krijanovsky, Lygia Filed By: Krijanovsky, Lygia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less