This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2018 at 16:33:25 (UTC).

Estate of Elizabeth Johanna Bandt

Case Summary

On 08/14/2015 Estate of Elizabeth Johanna Bandt was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator With Will Annexed

BANDT, GWENDOLYN

Decedent

BANDT, ELIZABETH JOHANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

RAU, HENRY T.

Attorney at RAU LAW FIRM

10435 Brooktree Terrace

San Diego, CA 92131

 

Court Documents

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. - 08/14/2015

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, Elizabeth

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/24/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Gwendolyn J. Bandt) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Order for Probate

Order for Probate filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Letters of Administration with Will Annexed

Letters of Administration with Will Annexed filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Self-Proving Will dated 10/27/67 admitted to probate on 09/24/2015. - 09/24/2015

Self-Proving Will dated 10/27/67 admitted to probate on 09/24/2015.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 09/24/2015 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Returned Mail

Returned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final ($225,000.00) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD

Notice of Failure to Perform Duties SD generated.

Report of Status of Administration and Petition to Extend Letters

Status Report (Report of Status of Administration and Petition to Extend Letters) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Status Report

Status Report (Report of Status of Administration; Petition for Extension of Administration) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts

Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Status Report scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 08/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Letters Extended/Reissued

Letters Extended/Reissued (Letters expire: 03/30/2018) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters Extended/Reissued (Letters expire: 03/30/2018) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 08/01/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Status Report set for 09/12/2017 at 09:00AM vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report (Report of Status of Administration; Petition for Extension of Administration) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Status Report heard 06/06/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Status Report continued pursuant to party's motion to 08/01/2017 at 09:00AM before Judge Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report scheduled for 06/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Status Report (Report of Status of Administration and Petition to Extend Letters) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2015
  • Will submitted by Bandt, Gwendolyn received but not filed on 08/14/2015. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Gwendolyn J. Bandt) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Christopher H. Bandt) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (William Mark Bandt II) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action (Victoria Rau) filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 09/24/2015 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, Elizabeth Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Bandt, Gwendolyn. Refers to: Bandt, Elizabeth Filed By: Bandt, Gwendolyn (Administrator With Will Annexed)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAU HENRY THEODORE