This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 01:04:07 (UTC).

Estate of Edward J Hickey Jr.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Estate of Edward J Hickey Jr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia C. Kelety. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Julia C. Kelety

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

Hickey, Edward M

Decedent

Hickey Jr, Edward J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 07/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Petition - Other

Petition for Letters of Administration filed by Hickey, Edward M. Refers to: Hickey, Edward; Hickey, Edward

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hickey, Edward M.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hickey, Edward M. Refers to: Hickey, Edward

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: 503; Event Type: Petition for Probate - Petition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 07/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 07/02/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 503 before Julia C. Kelety at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration filed by Hickey, Edward M. Refers to: Hickey, Edward; Hickey, Edward Filed By: Hickey, Edward M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Hickey, Edward M. Filed By: Hickey, Edward M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Hickey, Edward M. Refers to: Hickey, Edward Filed By: Hickey, Edward M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 03/26/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hickey, Edward M. Refers to: Hickey, Edward Filed By: Hickey, Edward M (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.