This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/24/2020 at 01:03:30 (UTC).

Estate of Celie Knighton Orourke aka Celie Knighton O'Rourke

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Estate of Celie Knighton Orourke aka Celie Knighton O'Rourke was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Longstreth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Longstreth

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Administrators

Smith, Chris

O'Rourke, Robert

Decedent

Orourke, Celie Knighton; AKA : O'Rourke, Celie Knighton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

BLISS, STEVEN F

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by O'Rourke, Robert.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by O'Rourke, Robert.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by O'Rourke, Robert.

Petition for Letters of Administration

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Refers to: Orourke, Celie; O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris

Consent - Other

Consent - Other (Consent to Serve As Co-Administrator) filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris.

Consent - Other

Consent - Other (Consent to Serve As Co-Administrator) filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris.

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris.

Notice of Hearing No Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail SD

Petition for Probate scheduled for 04/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

Notice of Case Assignment - Probate SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • HearingLocation: 502; Event Type: Petition for Probate - Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Petition for Probate was rescheduled to 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 502 before Robert Longstreth at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 06/03/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by O'Rourke, Robert. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by O'Rourke, Robert. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by O'Rourke, Robert. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Proposed Administrator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Refers to: Orourke, Celie; O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent - Other (Consent to Serve As Co-Administrator) filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent - Other (Consent to Serve As Co-Administrator) filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by O'Rourke, Robert; Smith, Chris. Filed By: O'Rourke, Robert (Petitioner); Smith, Chris (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Longstreth, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate scheduled for 04/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 502 Robert Longstreth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.