This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/31/2018 at 08:21:44 (UTC).

Estate of Arturo Felix Ledezma aka Arturo F Ledezma aka Arturo Ledezma

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 Estate of Arturo Felix Ledezma aka Arturo F Ledezma aka Arturo Ledezma was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA C. KELETY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA C. KELETY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

MOLINA, DANIELLA LEDEZMA

Decedent

LEDEZMA, ARTURO FELIX; AKA : LEDEZMA, ARTURO F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

MEEKER, KEITH L

7777 Alvarado Road 720

La Mesa, CA 91942

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 07/20/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Letters of Administration

Letters of Administration (Letters expire: 01/20/2019) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number

Inventory and Appraisal - Partial Number (1; $395,000.00) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Request for Special Notice

Request for Special Notice filed by Franchise Tax Board.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (State of California Franchise Tax Board's claim allowed for $3,638.79) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Internal Revenue Service's claim allowed for $25,031.20) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) (Consent) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim ($1,852.59) filed by Merrick Bank Corporation.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent)

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Inventory and Appraisal - Final

Inventory and Appraisal - Final filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Notice of Administration to Creditors

Notice of Administration to Creditors filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed by Franchise Tax Board.

Waiver of Final Accounting

Waiver of Final Accounting (Firest and Final Report of Perosnal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on: Waiver of Account; Payment of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Payment of Costs/Reimbursements) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Waiver - Other

Waiver - Other (Waiver of Administrator's Accounting By Daniella Ledezma Molina) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Refers to: Ledezma, Arturo; Molina, Daniella

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma.

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-Decedent's Estates and Trusts filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting and Final Distribution scheduled for 08/16/2018 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in 503 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver - Other (Waiver of Administrator's Accounting by Gabriella Ledezma) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver - Other (Waiver of Administrator's Accounting By Daniella Ledezma Molina) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Final Accounting (Firest and Final Report of Perosnal Representative and Petition for Final Distribution on: Waiver of Account; Payment of Statutory Fees to Attorney; Payment of Costs/Reimbursements) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim) filed by SAN DIEGO COUNTY TREASURER. Filed By: SAN DIEGO COUNTY TREASURER (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed by Internal Revenue Service. Filed By: Internal Revenue Service (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Creditor's Claim) filed by Internal Revenue Service. Filed By: Internal Revenue Service (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Claim for Personal Income Tax) filed by Franchise Tax Board. Filed By: Franchise Tax Board (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed by Franchise Tax Board. Filed By: Franchise Tax Board (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Order - Other (Order for Probate) submitted by Molina, Daniella Ledezma received but not filed on 06/08/2017. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in PC-2 Julia C. Kelety.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Kelety, Julia.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Consent - Other (Consent of Gabriela Ledezma to Appointment of Daniella Ledezma Molina as Administrator) filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Refers to: Ledezma, Arturo Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Molina, Daniella Ledezma. Refers to: Ledezma, Arturo; Molina, Daniella Filed By: Molina, Daniella Ledezma (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less