This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 10:30:24 (UTC).

Escrow Institute of California vs Egan

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Escrow Institute of California filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Egan. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA

ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE

Defendants

SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC

Egan, Timothy

CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC

Egan, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRUZZO, GREGORY J

Defendant Attorney

Brizolis, Alex G

 

Court Documents

Order - Other

Order - Other (SETTLEMENT DISCLOSURE FORM) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy.

Objections to Evidence ISO Defendants Opposition

Objections filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 07/31/2020 09:30:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Castro, CSR#6944, (760-994-7197)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of ReHearing re Petition to Compel

Notice - Other (OF RE-SET HEARING) filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (NOTICE OF RE-SET HEARING) filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (to defendants petition to compel arbitration) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice (in opposition) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Objections

Objections (to the declaration of Timothy Egan) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Objections

Objections (to the declaration of Timothy Egan) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of PJ Garcia in support of opposition to defendants petition to compel arbitration) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Beulah Stidham in opposition to defendants petition to compel arbitration) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Nancy Silberberg in opposition) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (of opposition, request for judicial notice, objections, declarations) filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 07/21/2020 01:30:00 PM.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 07/31/2020 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Joanne Castro, CSR#6944, (760-994-7197)) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Hearing on Petition published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy. Filed By: CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC (Defendant); Egan, Elizabeth (Defendant); SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC (Defendant); Egan, Timothy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy. Filed By: CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC (Defendant); Egan, Elizabeth (Defendant); SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC (Defendant); Egan, Timothy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; Egan, Timothy. Filed By: CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC (Defendant); Egan, Elizabeth (Defendant); SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC (Defendant); Egan, Timothy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 07/21/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (SETTLEMENT DISCLOSURE FORM) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/19/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Refers to: Egan, Timothy; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Refers to: Egan, Timothy; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA; ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. Refers to: Egan, Timothy; Egan, Elizabeth; SMITH & EGAN ASSOCIATES INC; CAPITAL REPRESENTATION GROUP INC Filed By: ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); ESCROW INSTITUTE OF CALIFORNIA POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRUZZO GREGORY JOSEPH