This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 06:32:05 (UTC).

Enriquez vs Mittman

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Enriquez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mittman. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enriquez, Daniel

Defendant

Mittman, Timothy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGENSEN, RICHARD ALLEN

Attorney at JORGENSEN & SALBERG LLP

15137 Woodlawn Ave

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorney

Luebke, Anthony

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DARLENE ROHR

14111 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Enriquez, Daniel.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy

Answer

Answer filed by Mittman, Timothy.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed by Mittman, Timothy.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Mittman, Timothy.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mittman, Timothy.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 06/18/2021 at 09:15:00 AM in C-70 before Carolyn Caietti at Central.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Filed By: Enriquez, Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 09:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy Filed By: Enriquez, Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mittman, Timothy. Filed By: Mittman, Timothy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed by Mittman, Timothy. Filed By: Mittman, Timothy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Mittman, Timothy. Filed By: Mittman, Timothy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Mittman, Timothy. Filed By: Mittman, Timothy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Caietti, Carolyn for 06/18/2021 at 09:40:00 AM in C-70 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 06/18/2021 at 09:15:00 AM in C-70 before Carolyn Caietti at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy Filed By: Enriquez, Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy Filed By: Enriquez, Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Enriquez, Daniel. Refers to: Mittman, Timothy Filed By: Enriquez, Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 09:40:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORGENSEN RICHARD ALLEN