This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 12:43:44 (UTC).

ENRIQUEZ vs Best Western International Inc

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 ENRIQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Best Western International Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA

Defendants

ASWANI, AKSHAY

Best Western International Inc

DOE, MALIA

SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosen Janfaza, Ilan N

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ILAN N ROSEN JANFAZA APC

9025 Wilshire Boulevard 304

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Initial Fee Waiver)

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

Notice to Litigants SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to John Meyer effective 05/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA.; Filed By: ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA.; Filed By: ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY; Filed By: ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY; Filed By: ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA. Refers to: Best Western International Inc; SURESTAY PLUS HOTEL BY BEST WESTERN CHULA VISTA WEST; DOE, MALIA; ASWANI, AKSHAY; Filed By: ENRIQUEZ, PRISCILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN JANFAZA ILAN N