This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 10:59:58 (UTC).

Enerbank USA vs. Plasse

Case Summary

On 09/27/2016 Enerbank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Plasse. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENERBANK USA

Defendant

PLASSE III, JOSEPH E; AKA : PLASSE, JOSEPH E;AKA : PLASSE, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEALD, DANIEL A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Enerbank USA.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Enerbank USA. Filed By: Enerbank USA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Plasse, Joseph E III.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Enerbank USA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph Filed By: Enerbank USA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Enerbank USA. Refers to: Plasse, Joseph Filed By: Enerbank USA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Enerbank USA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Enerbank USA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Enerbank USA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-07.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less