This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 02:13:21 (UTC).

Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America vs. Alberto Alvarado

Case Summary

On 06/28/2010 Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alberto Alvarado. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENDURANCE REINSURANCE CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Defendants

ALVARADO, ALBERTO

TC CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOZMA, JESSE E

Attorney at STOCKWELL HARRIS WOOLVERTON & MUEHL APC

3580 Wilshire Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

BALESTRERI, THOMAS A JR

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/14/2011 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 01/14/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2011 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 02/25/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/25/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other (STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; PROPOSED ORDER) submitted by TC Construction Inc rejected on 12/30/2010.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/11/2011 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/25/2011 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Randa Trapp.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

[Another document for ROA# 62]

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/18/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in E-15 before Randa Trapp at East County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (CONSOLIDATION TO LEAD CASE 10-68872) submitted by TC Construction Company rejected on 12/28/2010.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Wohlfeil,Joel effective 12/28/2010

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Eddie Sturgeon effective 02/22/2011

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/08/2011 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Reassignment of Mediator SD

Notice of Reassignment of Mediator SD generated.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketRequest for Payment of Trust Funds ((Jury Fees)) filed by TC Construction Inc. Filed By: TC Construction Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Docket37-2010-00069415-CU-PA-EC and 37-2010-00068872-CU-PA-EC deconsolidated on 02/07/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Refers to: Alvarado, Alberto; T C Construction Company Inc; TC Construction Inc Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/17/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/02/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • Docket37-2010-00068986-CL-PA-EC and 37-2010-00068872-CU-PA-EC deconsolidated on 02/07/2012.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATION TO UNCONSOLIDATE CASES; ORDER THEREON) filed by T C Construction Company Inc. Filed By: T C Construction Company Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT OF CARLO M. GALICIA ELIZONDO AS TO DEFENDANT T. C. CONSTRUCTION COMPANY only) submitted by Galicia Elizondo, Carlo M rejected on 10/25/2011. Refers to: T C Construction Company Inc Filed By: Galicia Elizondo, Carlo M (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • DocketOrder - Other (GRANTED FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE) filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Refers to: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America Filed By: TC Construction Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketCertificate of Progress: Inability to Serve (Granted) filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Refers to: Alvarado, Alberto Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Refers to: TC Construction Inc Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF FILING SUBROGATION COMPLAINT) filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketNotice - Other (Of Filing Subrogation Complaint) filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America. Filed By: Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Endurance Reinsurance Corporation of America.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T C Construction Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Endurance Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALESTRERI, THOMAS A Jr