This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 09:09:56 (UTC).

Encina Wastewater Authority vs National Oilwell Varco LP

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 Encina Wastewater Authority filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against National Oilwell Varco LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCINA WASTEWATER AUTHORITY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FLO-SYSTEMS INC

NATIONAL OILWELL VARCO LP

Defendant and Cross Defendant

NATIONAL OILWELL VARCO LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOSER, GREGORY V

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

OCHOA, ADRIANA R

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

REISINGER, ROBERT L

501 West Broadway Suite 2060

San Diego, CA 92101

MCLEAN, MICHAEL D

Attorney at ADELSON TESTAN BRUNDO NOVELL & JIMENEZ

1851 E First Street 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

MCLEAN, MICHAEL D

Attorney at ADELSON TESTAN BRUNDO NOVELL & JIMENEZ

1851 E First Street 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Defendant National Oilwell Varco, L.P.'s Verified and Amended Answer to Complaint

Amended Answer filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Answer

Answer filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Flo-Systems Inc. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Flo-Systems Inc. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP

Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Answer

Motion to Strike (Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Answer) filed by Encina Wastewater Authority.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Answer

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Answer) filed by Encina Wastewater Authority.

Declaration of P Jacob Kozaczuk in Support of Motion to Strike Answer

Declaration - Other (Declaration of P Jacob Kozaczuk in Support of Motion to Strike Answer) filed by Encina Wastewater Authority.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Encina Wastewater Authority.

Amended Answer

Amended Answer filed by Flo-Systems Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP

Answer

Answer filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by National Oilwell Varco LP.

Answer

Answer filed by Flo-Systems Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Flo-Systems Inc.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference set for 06/15/2018 at 10:00 a.m. vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer filed by National Oilwell Varco LP. Filed By: National Oilwell Varco LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by National Oilwell Varco LP. Filed By: National Oilwell Varco LP (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by National Oilwell Varco LP. Filed By: National Oilwell Varco LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Flo-Systems Inc. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP Filed By: Flo-Systems Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Flo-Systems Inc. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP Filed By: Flo-Systems Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Flo-Systems Inc. Filed By: Flo-Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (Amended) filed by Encina Wastewater Authority; Encina Wastewater Authority. Refers to: Flo-Systems Inc; National Oilwell Varco LP Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff); Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2018 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP; Flo-Systems Inc Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP; Flo-Systems Inc Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Encina Wastewater Authority. Refers to: National Oilwell Varco LP; Flo-Systems Inc Filed By: Encina Wastewater Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Encina Wastewater Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where National Oilwell Varco, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory V Moser

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adriana Raquel Ochoa