This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/14/2019 at 00:06:12 (UTC).

Emergency Services Restoration Inc vs Darrow

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 Emergency Services Restoration Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Darrow. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emergency Services Restoration Inc

Defendant

Darrow, Carolyn C

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Emergency Services Restoration Inc. Refers to: Darrow, Carolyn

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/12/2019 01:00:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/12/2019 01:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Emergency Services Restoration Inc. Refers to: Darrow, Carolyn Filed By: Emergency Services Restoration Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERGENCY SERVICES RESTORATION INC. is a litigant