This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/18/2020 at 09:18:28 (UTC).

Emergency Protective Order of Fischbeck

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Emergency Protective Order of Fischbeck was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

San Diego Police Department

Respondent

Fischbeck, Daniel

 

Court Documents

Gun Violence Restraining Order After Hearing

Gun Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department.

Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service (GV-030) filed by San Diego Police Department.

Gun Violence Emergency Protective Order

Gun Violence Emergency Protective Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel

Notice of Court Hearing (Gun Violence Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing (Gun Violence Prevention) filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/24/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service ((defective-not signed)) filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service (GV-030) filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Restraining order as requested against Daniel Fischbeck was granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/24/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Gun Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by San Diego Police Department. Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/24/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/22/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Personal Service ((defective-not signed)) filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/22/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Gun Violence Emergency Protective Order filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 01/24/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Court Hearing (Gun Violence Prevention) filed by San Diego Police Department. Refers to: Fischbeck, Daniel Filed By: San Diego Police Department (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.