This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 08:06:25 (UTC).

Elliott vs Scripps Health Inc

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 Elliott filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Scripps Health Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth J Medel and Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kenneth J Medel

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIOTT, ROBERT

Defendant

Scripps Health Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Golden, Jeremy S

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

3130 Bonita Road 200

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Chow, Teresa C.

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Medel, Kenneth J to Gregory Pollack effective 04/06/2022

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Transfer ACtion to D-71 of the Superior court of California, County of San Diego) filed by Scripps Health Inc.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Order - Other (Granting Transfer of Action to D71) filed by Scripps Health Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Medel, Kenneth J to Gregory Pollack effective 04/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Transfer of Action to D71) filed by Scripps Health Inc.; Filed By: Scripps Health Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc; Filed By: ELLIOTT, ROBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Transfer ACtion to D-71 of the Superior court of California, County of San Diego) filed by Scripps Health Inc.; Filed By: Scripps Health Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc; Filed By: ELLIOTT, ROBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc; Filed By: ELLIOTT, ROBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc; Filed By: ELLIOTT, ROBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ELLIOTT, ROBERT. Refers to: Scripps Health Inc; Filed By: ELLIOTT, ROBERT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scripps Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.