Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/16/2021 at 09:11:57 (UTC).

Elizabeth vs James

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Elizabeth filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against James. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Elizabeth, Linda

Respondent

JAMES, SHERRI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 08/26/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail filed by JAMES, SHERRI. Filed By: JAMES, SHERRI (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail (Notice of Hearing as to Linda Elizabeth) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/26/2020 at 09:00AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Refers to: Amat, Cameron; Amat, Ivan; JAMES, SHERRI Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Refers to: Amat, Cameron; Amat, Ivan; JAMES, SHERRI Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Refers to: Amat, Cameron; Amat, Ivan; JAMES, SHERRI Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Refers to: Amat, Cameron; Amat, Ivan; JAMES, SHERRI Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/20/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRequest - Other (to Keep Minor's Information Confidential) filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (on Request to Keep Minor's Information Confidential - Denied) filed by Elizabeth, Linda. Filed By: Elizabeth, Linda (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less