This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/04/2018 at 16:38:10 (UTC).

El Harouni vs. BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2013 El Harouni filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE BACAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE BACAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EL HAROUNI, MARILYN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC

AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES, INC.

SEVEN SEAS ASSOCIATES LLC; DBA : BEST WESTERN SEVEN SEAS;ESA : BEST WESTERN SEVEN SEAS

GENERAL SECURITY SERVICE INC

Cross Defendants

KELLY, DOMINIQUE

KELLY, DOMINQUE

SEVEN SEAS ASSOCIATES LLC; DBA : BEST WESTERN SEVEN SEAS;ESA : BEST WESTERN SEVEN SEAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYRNES, JAMES

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JAMES BYRNES

500 Fifth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HASKINS, KEITH A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TRACEY LAZARUS

17901 Von Karman Avenue 300

Irvine, CA 92614-5240

HUMISTON, CAROL A

700 N Brand Blvd

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUMISTON, CAROL A

700 N Brand Blvd

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Refers to: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by El Harouni, Marilyn.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Seven Seas Associates LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/07/2014 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by American Guard Services, Inc.. Refers to: Kelly, Dominique

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by American Guard Services, Inc.. Refers to: Kelly, Dominique

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Guard Services, Inc..

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by American Guard Services, Inc..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/30/2015 10:30:00 AM.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Refers to: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

[Another document for ROA# 94]

Statement of Undisputed Facts

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Seven Seas Associates LLC.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by TURNER, JOHN.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Filed By: El Harouni, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to El Harouni, Marilyn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to American Guard Services, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Seven Seas Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to American Guard Services, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kelly, Dominique .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Seven Seas Associates LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to El Harouni, Marilyn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Kelly, Dominque .

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (General Denial) filed by Seven Seas Associates LLC. Refers to: El Harouni, Marilyn Filed By: Seven Seas Associates LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (General Denial) filed by BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. Refers to: El Harouni, Marilyn Filed By: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Filed By: El Harouni, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/10/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-67 William S. Dato.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dato, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Refers to: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC Filed By: El Harouni, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Refers to: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC Filed By: El Harouni, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by El Harouni, Marilyn. Refers to: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC; Seven Seas Associates LLC; General Security Service Inc; American Guard Services, Inc. Filed By: El Harouni, Marilyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Seven Seas Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN GUARD SERVICES INC. is a litigant