This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 14:08:35 (UTC).

El Dorado Investments vs. Ernesto Bravo

Case Summary

On 10/26/2010 El Dorado Investments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ernesto Bravo. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EL DORADO INVESTMENTS

Defendants

BRAVO, LORRAINE

BRAVO, ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKINLEY, JAMES R

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 07/19/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/01/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from S-02 to William Cannon effective 04/08/2011

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Entry of Default submitted by El Dorado Investments rejected on 12/02/2010. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 07/19/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) heard 08/09/2017 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/01/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) heard 03/04/2011 09:15:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) heard 04/08/2011 09:15:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by El Dorado Investments. Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Bravo, Lorraine, on 11/18/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Bravo, Ernesto, on 11/18/2010, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Returned Mail (Minute order dated 8/9/17 as to Ernesto Bravo and Lorraine Bravo) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) heard 08/09/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Claim of exemption is Denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Claim of Exemption - Notice of Opposition filed by El Dorado Investments. Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Claim of Exemption - Notice of Hearing (as to Ernesto Bravo) filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Opposition to Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (Civil) scheduled for 08/09/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-07 .

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2011
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed (Unlawful Detainer) scheduled for 03/04/2011 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default submitted by El Dorado Investments rejected on 12/02/2010. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2010
  • Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine. Filed By: Bravo, Ernesto (Defendant); Bravo, Lorraine (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Original Summons filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by El Dorado Investments. Refers to: Bravo, Ernesto; Bravo, Lorraine Filed By: El Dorado Investments (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.