This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 03:13:20 (UTC).

Prieto vs. Choi

Case Summary

On 05/11/2016 Prieto filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Choi. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Claimants

PRIETO, ANTHONY

PRIETO, EDWARD

PRIETO, EDOUARD

Guardian Ad Litem and Petitioner

HOFFMAN, KAITLIN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WARSHAWSKY, JON MICHAEL

CHOI, HYUN JEONG

KIM, MI S

DOHERTY, AUDREY ; DBA : CPR CLASSIC RESTORATION

DOHERTY, ANDREA ; DBA : CPR CLASSIC RESTORATION

CHOI, HYUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Claimant Attorney

DICKS, JOSEPH G

Attorney at DICKS & WORKMAN APC

750 B Street 2720

San Diego, CA 92101-8122

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHIELDS, MARK D.

9655 Granite Ridge Drive 450

San Diego, CA 92123

PALMER, CHARLES A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC G ANDERSON

675 Placentia Avenue Suite 201

Brea, CA 92821

TROPP, DEBORAH S

MEISSNER, CHRISTINA N.

2 Park Plaza #620

Irvine, CA 92614

THOMPSON, KELLIE B

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

3111 Camino Del Rio North 700

San Diego, CA 92108

GARCHIE, PETER L

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

RICKSECKER, LISA L

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Prieto, Edouard; Prieto, Anthony.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Doherty, Audrey.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Anthony Prieto) filed by Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Warshawsky, Jon Michael. Refers to: Doherty, Andrea

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (served Carlos Prieto) filed by Prieto, Anthony; Prieto, Edward.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (AMENDED) filed by Prieto, Edouard; Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Warshawsky, Jon

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Hyun Jeong Choi) filed by Hoffman, Kaitlin. Refers to: Choi, Hyun

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Hoffman, Kaitlin.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Doherty, Andrea.

Minute Order with attachment

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 08/26/2016 03:00:00 PM.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Doherty, Andrea. Refers to: Warshawsky, Jon; Choi, Hyun; Kim, Mi

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (served Edward Prieto, a minor) filed by Prieto, Anthony; Prieto, Edward.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Doherty, Andrea.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Prieto, Edward; Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Choi, Hyun; Kim, Mi; Warshawsky, Jon

Notice to Filing Party SD

Association of Attorney submitted by Choi, Hyun; Kim, Mi S rejected on 01/26/2017.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct.

Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Acct. filed by Hoffman, Kaitlin; Prieto, Edouard.

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (For Trial Preference) filed by Prieto, Edouard; Prieto, Anthony.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Hoffman, Kaitlin. Filed By: Hoffman, Kaitlin (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Doherty, Andrea .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Choi, Hyun .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Warshawsky, Jon Michael .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Warshawsky, Jon Michael. Filed By: Warshawsky, Jon Michael (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Warshawsky, Jon Michael .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Hoffman, Kaitlin. Refers to: Warshawsky, Jon Filed By: Hoffman, Kaitlin (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Doherty, Audrey. Filed By: Doherty, Audrey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2016
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Edward Prieto) filed by Prieto, Edward. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin Filed By: Prieto, Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Anthony Prieto) filed by Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin Filed By: Prieto, Anthony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration in support of Application & Order for GAL Re 2 Minor Children) filed by Prieto, Anthony; Prieto, Edward. Filed By: Prieto, Anthony (Plaintiff); Prieto, Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Prieto, Edward rejected on 05/31/2016. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin Filed By: Prieto, Edward (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2016 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prieto, Edward; Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin; Choi, Hyun; Kim, Mi; Warshawsky, Jon Filed By: Prieto, Edward (Plaintiff); Prieto, Anthony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Prieto, Edward; Prieto, Anthony. Refers to: Hoffman, Kaitlin; Choi, Hyun; Kim, Mi; Warshawsky, Jon Filed By: Prieto, Edward (Plaintiff); Prieto, Anthony (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.