This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:48:38 (UTC).

Ebarahimi vs Land Rover North America LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Ebarahimi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Land Rover North America LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ebarahimi, Saman M

Defendants

LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC

Hoehn Motors Inc; DBA : Jaguar Land Rover Carlsbad

Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobson, Kevin Y

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC) filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC) filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC. Filed By: Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC) filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC) filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc; Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ebarahimi, Saman M. Refers to: LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC; Hoehn Motors Inc Filed By: Ebarahimi, Saman M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.