This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:14:05 (UTC).

Dwight Banks vs Einstein Bros Bagels #2426

Case Summary

On 11/09/2016 Dwight Banks filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Einstein Bros Bagels 2426. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANKS, DWIGHT

Defendants

EINSTEIN BROS BAGELS #2426

EINSTEIN AND NOAH CORP

FW CA NAVAJO SHOPPING CENTER LLC

EINSTEIN AND NOAH CORP; DBA : EINSTEIN BROS BAGELS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIN, TED S

Attorney at BOARDWALK LAW FIRM

888 Prospect Street 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

MOORE, BONITA

1600, 11766 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90025

RUDDELL, HOWARD D.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by Banks, Dwight was denied. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426

Einstein and Noah Corp's Answer to Verified Complaint for Damages

Answer filed by Einstein and Noah Corp.

FW CA-Navajo Shopping Center, LLC's Answer to Verified Complaint for Damages

Answer filed by FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Banks, Dwight.

Defendant's Application and Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference

Defendant's Application and Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference filed by Einstein and Noah Corp.

Notice and Order of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference

Notice and Order of Stay of Proceedings and Early Evaluation Conference filed by Einstein and Noah Corp.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 05/26/2017 at 09:15:00 AM in C-72 before Timothy Taylor at Central.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Einstein and Noah Corporation) filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein and Noah Corp

Proof of Service Disability Access Litigation

Proof of Service filed by Einstein and Noah Corp.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (to Defendant's Early Evaluation Conference) filed by Banks, Dwight.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Plaintiff's Early Evaluation Conference Statement

Plaintiff's Early Evaluation Conference Statement filed by Banks, Dwight.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Banks, Dwight.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426; Einstein and Noah Corp; FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Banks, Dwight, on 11/10/2016, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Banks, Dwight, on 11/10/2016, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Banks, Dwight .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Einstein and Noah Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Einstein and Noah Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Einstein Bros Bagels #2426.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Banks, Dwight. Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Early Evaluation Conference Statement filed by Banks, Dwight. Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • **Default Papers Received**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426 Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Banks, Dwight. Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/14/2017 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426; Einstein and Noah Corp; FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Banks, Dwight. Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426; Einstein and Noah Corp; FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Banks, Dwight. Refers to: Einstein Bros Bagels #2426; Einstein and Noah Corp; FW CA Navajo Shopping Center LLC; Einstein and Noah Corp Filed By: Banks, Dwight (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EINSTEIN AND NOAH CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruddell, Howard D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE BONITA D.