This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 07:04:39 (UTC).

Duron vs J Contreras Transports LLC

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Duron filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J Contreras Transports LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duron, Leo Alejandro

Defendants and Cross Defendants

J Contreras Transports LLC

Toledo, Erick Z

Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc

DIAKON LOGISTICS DELAWARE INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc

DIAKON LOGISTICS DELAWARE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zaback, Harlan J

Attorney at BERMAN & RIEDEL LLP

12264 El Camino Real 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RITCHIE, GARY L

Attorney at SANTA CRUZ CANNON & KOTHARY

P O Box 7218

London, KY 40742-7218

Nevis, Christopher J

333 Bush Street Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Smith, Sandra Jamie

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF OSTIN & KOTHARY

1615 Murray Canyon Road 300

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to the Complaint) filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: Toledo, Erick

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/04/2022 at 10:45:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/16/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Change of Mailing Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Toledo, Erick Z; J Contreras Transports LLC.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro.

Case Management Statement & POS

Case Management Statement filed by Toledo, Erick Z; J Contreras Transports LLC.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees & POS

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Toledo, Erick Z; J Contreras Transports LLC.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (without prejudice as to Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc Cross Complaint) filed by Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc.

Substitution of Attorney (Participant Information)

Substitution of Attorney filed by DIAKON LOGISTICS DELAWARE INC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc. Refers to: J Contreras Transports LLC; Toledo, Erick; DIAKON LOGISTICS DELAWARE INC

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 14]

Answer (First Papers)

[Another document for ROA# 14]

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Toledo, Erick Z; J Contreras Transports LLC.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Duron, Leo Alejandro .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Toledo, Erick Z .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to J Contreras Transports LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with Prejudice as to the Complaint) filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro.; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: Toledo, Erick; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/04/2022 at 10:45:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Toledo, Erick Z; J Contreras Transports LLC.; Filed By: Toledo, Erick Z (Defendant); J Contreras Transports LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: J Contreras Transports LLC; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: Toledo, Erick; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: J Contreras Transports LLC; Toledo, Erick; Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: J Contreras Transports LLC; Toledo, Erick; Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Duron, Leo Alejandro. Refers to: J Contreras Transports LLC; Toledo, Erick; Jeromes Furniture Wearhouse Inc; Filed By: Duron, Leo Alejandro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less