This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 05:50:54 (UTC).

Duong VS Flagship Research Inc

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Duong filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Flagship Research Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUONG, RUSSELL

Defendants

Flagship Research Inc

Helleis, Jacueline C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ghavimi, Aidin D

Attorney at STARPOINT LC

Defendant Attorney

Butler, Donna

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted In whole) filed by DUONG, RUSSELL.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Summons

Original Summons filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline

Complaint

Complaint filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline C.

NOTICE OF CIVIL DEPOSIT IN RE FILING FIRST PAPER FEES.

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF CIVIL DEPOSIT IN RE FILING FIRST PAPER FEES) filed by DUONG, RUSSELL.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by DUONG, RUSSELL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF CIVIL DEPOSIT IN RE FILING FIRST PAPER FEES) filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Flagship Research Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Helleis, Jacueline C .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to DUONG, RUSSELL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline C. Filed By: Flagship Research Inc (Defendant); Helleis, Jacueline C (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted In whole) filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Refers to: Flagship Research Inc; Helleis, Jacueline Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by DUONG, RUSSELL. Filed By: DUONG, RUSSELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTLER DONNA MARIE