This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 06:19:12 (UTC).

Duarte vs Polaris Industries Inc

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Duarte filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Polaris Industries Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duarte, Richard Jesus

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Acme Cycles Inc; DBA : Motoworld of El Cajon

Polaris Industries Inc

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Polaris Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cloyd, Jeremy

Peters, Craig

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Geri, Joseph

Hudson, Clark R

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Hudson, Clark R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

POS of Summons & Complaint as to Def. Acme Cycles, Inc.

Proof of Service filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.

POS of Summons & Complaint as to Def. Polaris

Proof of Service filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus; Duarte, Richard Jesus.

Answer

Answer filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Application of to Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice) filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Application - Other

Application - Other (Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice) filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (In support of Application to appear as counsel Pro Hac Vice) submitted by Polaris Industries Inc received but not filed on 09/30/2021.

Notice - Other

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by Polaris Industries Inc received but not filed on 10/07/2021.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Acme Cycles Inc. Refers to: Polaris Industries Inc

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Agreed Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Documents) filed by Polaris Industries Inc; Duarte, Richard Jesus.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus. Refers to: Polaris Industries Inc; Acme Cycles Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.

Summons

Original Summons filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Notice to Litigants SD

Notice to Litigants SD generated.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Polaris Industries Inc. Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Agreed Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Documents) filed by Polaris Industries Inc; Duarte, Richard Jesus. Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant); Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Acme Cycles Inc. Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Acme Cycles Inc. Refers to: Polaris Industries Inc Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Polaris Industries Inc. Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Polaris Industries Inc. Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Polaris Industries Inc received but not filed on 10/07/2021. Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Styn, Ronald L. to Carolyn Caietti effective 08/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus. Refers to: Polaris Industries Inc; Acme Cycles Inc Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus. Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus. Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less