This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/05/2023 at 19:10:40 (UTC).

Duarte vs Polaris Industries Inc

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Duarte filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Polaris Industries Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Duarte, Richard Jesus

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Acme Cycles Inc; DBA : Motoworld of El Cajon

Polaris Industries Inc

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Polaris Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cloyd, Jeremy

Peters, Craig

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Geri, Joseph

Clem, Trischler C

Hudson, Clark R

Reefer, Jason

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Clem, Trischler C

Hudson, Clark R

Reefer, Jason

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ACME CYCLES INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION AND STAY

Opposition - Other filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.

Order - Other (Order)

Proposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 09/28/2023.

Motion - Other (Motions)

Motion - Other filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/19/2023 08:30:00 AM.

Polaris' Opposition to Acme's Ex Parte

Opposition - Other (TO ACMES EX PARTE APPLICATION) filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Order - Other (Order)

Proposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 09/13/2023.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Ex Parte)

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 08/31/2023.

Motion for Leave to Amend (Motions)

Motion for Leave to Amend filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/25/2023 10:30:00 AM.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 08/21/2023.

Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint (Motions)

Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Polaris Industries Inc.

Opposition - Other (Opposition & Replies)

Opposition - Other (TO POLARIS INDUSTRIES INCS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT) filed by Acme Cycles Inc.

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2024

HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil) - Motion for Leave to Amend

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

HearingLocation: 2103; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

HearingLocation: 2103; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 09/28/2023.; Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion - Other filed by Acme Cycles Inc.; Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/19/2023 08:30:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOpposition - Other filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.; Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOpposition - Other (TO ACMES EX PARTE APPLICATION) filed by Polaris Industries Inc.; Filed By: Polaris Industries Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order submitted by Acme Cycles Inc received but not filed on 09/13/2023.; Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Acme Cycles Inc.; Filed By: Acme Cycles Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
162 More Docket Entries
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketCase reassigned from Judge Styn, Ronald L. to Carolyn Caietti effective 08/10/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2021

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.; Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus.; Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Duarte, Richard Jesus. Refers to: Polaris Industries Inc; Acme Cycles Inc; Filed By: Duarte, Richard Jesus (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less