Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 08:19:14 (UTC).

Drobnicki vs Ostrom-Reid

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Drobnicki filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ostrom-Reid. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DROBNICKI, EDWARD

Defendants

Real Estate of the Pacific; DBA : Pacific Sotheby's

Ostrom-Reid, Jodene May

Kroepel, Amy

Huff, Ilana

Pickford Real Estate Inc; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Home Services

PACIFIC SOTHEBYS INTL REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fanning, Charles L

Attorney at THE FANNING LAW FIRM APC

Defendant Attorney

Harrison, Robert

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Huff, Ilana; PACIFIC SOTHEBYS INTL REALTY.

Complaint

Complaint filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Huff, Ilana; PACIFIC SOTHEBYS INTL REALTY. Filed By: Huff, Ilana (Defendant); PACIFIC SOTHEBYS INTL REALTY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific; PACIFIC SOTHEBYS INTL REALTY Filed By: DROBNICKI, EDWARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific Filed By: DROBNICKI, EDWARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by DROBNICKI, EDWARD. Refers to: Ostrom-Reid, Jodene; Kroepel, Amy; Pickford Real Estate Inc; Huff, Ilana; Real Estate of the Pacific Filed By: DROBNICKI, EDWARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fanning, Charles L.