This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 08:23:27 (UTC).

Douglas vs Oportun Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Douglas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oportun Financial Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Randa Trapp. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Randa Trapp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas, Dennis

Defendants

Opportun Inc

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Oportun Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD M FRIEDMAN

21550 Oxnard Street 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

Howell, Edwin

4655 Executive Drive 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(ORDER SIGNED 3/5/19) filed by Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Douglas, Dennis.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Opportun Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Experian Information Solutions Inc

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 09:40:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filed By: Experian Information Solutions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filed By: Experian Information Solutions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filed By: Experian Information Solutions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Filed By: Experian Information Solutions Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc. Filed By: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant); Opportun Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)(ORDER SIGNED 3/5/19) filed by Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Douglas, Dennis. Filed By: Oportun Financial Corporation (Defendant); Opportun Inc (Defendant); Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Opportun Inc Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis. Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Experian Information Solutions Inc Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2019 at 09:40:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Douglas, Dennis. Refers to: Oportun Financial Corporation; Opportun Inc; Experian Information Solutions Inc Filed By: Douglas, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.