Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 06:11:04 (UTC).

Douglas Krochak vs. SOS Upholstery

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Douglas Krochak filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOS Upholstery. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Krochak, Douglas

Defendant

SOS Upholstery

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 12/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-62 before at Central.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Krochak, Douglas. Refers to: SOS Upholstery

Notice of Hearing SD

Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Krochak, Douglas. Refers to: SOS Upholstery

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 12/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Krochak, Douglas. Refers to: SOS Upholstery Filed By: Krochak, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to SOS Upholstery.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Krochak, Douglas .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 12/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in C-62 before at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 12/28/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/25/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Krochak, Douglas. Refers to: SOS Upholstery Filed By: Krochak, Douglas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less