Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 01:36:43 (UTC).

Dorian Golu vs. Stephen Linges

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Dorian Golu filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Stephen Linges. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Golu, Dorian

Respondent

Linges, Stephen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DiRe, Daniel M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: E-21; Event Type: Hearing on Restraining Order - Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Golu, Dorian; Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner); Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Golu, Dorian; Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner); Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketRespondent's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 03/17/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Linges, Stephen. Refers to: Golu, Dorian; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Linges, Stephen (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 03/17/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment filed by Golu, Dorian. Refers to: Linges, Stephen; Golu, Alexander Filed By: Golu, Dorian (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DiRe, Daniel M