This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/05/2018 at 12:43:34 (UTC).

Dora Akka vs. Elena Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 01/27/2010 Dora Akka filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Elena Gutierrez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AKKAN, DORA

AKKAN, ALEXANDER

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, JESUS

GUTIERREZ, ELENA

GUTIERREZ, DAVID

BRINSON, DARLENE

CASTILLON, CAROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMEZ, DANIEL R

Attorney at GNAU & TAMEZ LAW GROUP LLC

1100, 707 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GOMES, DAVID A

Attorney at GOMES HIRSHIK & HUMMEL

16815 Von Karman 250

Irvine, CA 92606

GLANZ, TODD G

Attorney at LAWYERS FOR JUSTICE

2127 Olympic Pkwy

Chula Vista, CA 91915

KOWALCZYK, DARLENE R

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARVIN P VELASTEGUI

14111 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

SHEDLOSKY, JOY L

Attorney at GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY & JENNETT LLP

First National Bank Center, 401 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/24/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/24/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/10/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 05/10/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

OSC - Sanctions scheduled for 06/09/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 06/09/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/25/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/06/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/08/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/08/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/13/2012 08:35:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 05/16/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 05/16/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross-Compalint filed by Darlene Brinson) filed by Brinson, Darlene. Filed By: Brinson, Darlene (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Cross Complaint filed by Carol Castillon) filed by Castillon, Carol. Filed By: Castillon, Carol (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/13/2012 08:35:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Akka, Dora; Akkan, Alexander. Refers to: Martinez, Jesus Filed By: Akkan, Dora (Plaintiff); Akkan, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Akka, Dora; Akkan, Alexander. Refers to: Gutierrez, Elena Filed By: Akkan, Dora (Plaintiff); Akkan, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Akka, Dora; Akkan, Alexander. Refers to: Gutierrez, David Filed By: Akkan, Dora (Plaintiff); Akkan, Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (Homero Godinez) filed by Akkan, Alexander.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Application for Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by Akka, Dora.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Akka, Dora.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Akka, Dora.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Complaint filed by Akka, Dora.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.