This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 19:38:48 (UTC).

Donn S. Lowrey, individually and as Trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreeement Dated April 1, 2011 vs. Gould Electric Inc

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 Donn S Lowrey, individually and as Trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreeement Dated April 1, 2011 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gould Electric Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRANDPOINT BANK

LOWREY, DONN S

DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011

Defendants and Plaintiffs

EILEEN MEYERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN AND EILEEN MEYERS FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 16 2004

CYNTHIA M THURMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE THURMAN FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 12 1998

DONN S LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED APRIL 1 2011

JOHN GEORGE MEYERS AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN AND EILEEN MEYERS FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED MARCH 16 2004

GOULD ELECTRIC INC

MEYERS, JOHN G; AKA : MEYERS, JOHN GEORGE

THURMAN, RUSSELL W

RUSSELL W THURMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE THURMAN FAMILY TRUST AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 12 1998

LOWREY, DONN S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

WARRINGTON, GERRICK M

1000 Wilshire Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

FLETCHER, MICHAEL G

6500 Wilshire Blvd 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90048

TENCER, PHILIP C

12520 High Bluff Drive 240

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed by LOWREY, DONN S; DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by LOWREY, DONN S; DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by LOWREY, DONN S; DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Gould Electric Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Grandpoint Bank.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Lowrey, Donn

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident)

Ex Parte Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident) filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Lowrey, Donn

RE Temporary Protective Order

Proposed Order (RE Temporary Protective Order) submitted by Grandpoint Bank received but not filed on 04/21/2017. Refers to: Lowrey, Donn

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc.

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Gould Electric Inc. Filed By: Gould Electric Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Grandpoint Bank.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LOWREY, DONN S .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Lowrey, Donn S .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Gould Electric Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Thurman, Russell W .

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judicial Notice filed by Grandpoint Bank. Filed By: Grandpoint Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Grandpoint Bank. Filed By: Grandpoint Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/25/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998 Filed By: Grandpoint Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998 Filed By: Grandpoint Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Grandpoint Bank. Refers to: Gould Electric Inc; Lowrey, Donn; Donn S Lowrey as trustee of the Donn Stephen Lowrey Trust Agreement Dated April 1 2011; Meyers, John; John George Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Eileen Meyers as trustee of the John and Eileen Meyers Family Trust Agreement Dated March 16 2004; Thurman, Russell; Russell W Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998; Cynthia M Thurman as trustee of the Thurman Family Trust Agreement Dated November 12 1998 Filed By: Grandpoint Bank (Plaintiff); LOWREY, DONN S (Plaintiff); DONN S. LOWREY AS TRUSTEE OF THE DONN STEPHEN LOWREY TRUST AGREEEMENT DATED APRIL 1, 2011 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOULD ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANDPOINT BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tencer, Philip C