This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/30/2020 at 01:50:02 (UTC).

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc vs Olivares

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Don Roberto Jewelers Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Olivares. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Roberto Jewelers Inc

Defendant

Olivares, Josue

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Olivares, Josue

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Olivares, Josue

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/19/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Olivares, Josue Filed By: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Don Roberto Jewelers Inc. Refers to: Olivares, Josue Filed By: Don Roberto Jewelers Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/19/2020 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.