This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/03/2019 at 02:40:33 (UTC).

Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC vs. U.S. Medical Instruments, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2009 Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against U S Medical Instruments, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERIC L. LINK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERIC L. LINK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AVESAR, ARIE

DOLPHIN INVESTMENT ENTERPRISES LLC

AVESAR, RUTH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

US MEDICAL INSTRUMENTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BARBAT, LEANNE E

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr

San Diego, CA 92108

THORN, ROBERT C

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Drive 900

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FRYE, AUTUMN S

Attorney at MILTNER & MENCK

402 W Broadway #800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 2 of 2

Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 2 of 2

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion to Quash (UD) heard 10/23/2009 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 11/30/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 11/23/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from S-02 to William Cannon effective 11/23/2009

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/12/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/29/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/29/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/22/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/22/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/14/2011 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/15/2011 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/30/2011 09:00:00 AM.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 2 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 05/08/17 - volume 1 of 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied (SAN DIEGO) filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC. Refers to: US Medical Instruments Inc Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2011
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Change of Address) filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC; AVESAR, ARIE. Refers to: US Medical Instruments Inc Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff); AVESAR, ARIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/07/2011 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-26 Frederic L. Link was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Objections (Objection to Declaration of Rebecca Fortune in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application) filed by US Medical Instruments Inc. Filed By: US Medical Instruments Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Response (Defendant U.S. Medical Instruments Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application) filed by US Medical Instruments Inc. Filed By: US Medical Instruments Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • Judgment entered for AVESAR, ARIE ;Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC and against US Medical Instruments Inc for a grand total of 220000.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2009
  • Motion to Quash (UD) scheduled for 10/23/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • Motion to Quash (UD) reassigned to for 10/23/2009 at 09:30:00 AM in S-04 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (MOTION OF QUASH SERVICE) filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC. Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • Motion to Quash (UD) scheduled for 10/23/2009 at 09:30:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • Motion to Quash Service of Summons (And Complaint) filed by U.S. Medical Instruments, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • Case assigned to Department S-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC. Refers to: US Medical Instruments Inc Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC. Refers to: US Medical Instruments Inc Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • Complaint filed by Dolphin Investment Enterprises, LLC. Refers to: US Medical Instruments Inc Filed By: Dolphin Investment Enterprises LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.