This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 04:41:35 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Laam

Case Summary

On 05/01/2012 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laam. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Laam, Stephanie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bemis, Gary A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GARY A BEMIS

La Sierra Ave

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Laam, Stephanie.

Answer

Answer filed by Laam, Stephanie.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Laam, Stephanie.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

Notice to Filing Party SD

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings submitted by Discover Bank rejected on 07/10/2012.

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Discover Bank.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Discover Bank rejected on 09/10/2012.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Laam, Stephanie, on 06/08/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Laam, Stephanie, on 06/08/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Discover Bank rejected on 09/10/2012. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/24/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings submitted by Discover Bank rejected on 07/10/2012. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/24/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Laam, Stephanie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Laam, Stephanie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Laam, Stephanie Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less