This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/23/2018 at 12:08:24 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Farris

Case Summary

On 02/09/2012 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Farris. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Farris, Brandi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boulanger, Michael R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX APC

4545 Murphy Canyon Road 3Rd Floor

San Diego, CA 92123

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 2]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue filed by Discover Bank

Statement of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi

Answer

Answer filed by Farris, Brandi. Refers to: Discover Bank

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Answer) filed by Farris, Brandi. Refers to: Discover Bank

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2012 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-21 .

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (and Supporting Documents) filed by Discover Bank.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Nonappearance at Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Discover Bank.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Motion for Judgment on Pleadings and Supporting Documents) filed by Discover Bank.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Discover Bank.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/29/2012 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Discover Bank.

Stipulated Settlement and Dismissal

Stipulated Settlement and Dismissal filed by Discover Bank.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Settlement and Dismissal filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/29/2012 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) set for 07/13/12 at 09:00 am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (Motion for Judgment on Pleadings and Supporting Documents) filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice of Nonappearance at Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) filed by Discover Bank. Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Farris, Brandi Filed By: Discover Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.